Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Westlake Financial Services, Westlake Services Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kruss, Ramiro, against Hester, Amy N, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with GALEN, PHYLLIS R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGALEN, PHYLLIS R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness - $8,001 To $15,000 (South County) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Westlake Services LLC, also known as Westlake Financial Services, against the defendant Amy N Hester. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant entered into a contract to finance the purchase of a vehicle through the plainti...
SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-AMY N HESTER - ISSUED - 9/9/2021
Date: September 02, 2021PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021075231
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE
Date: February 03, 2022SUMMONS SERVED - AMY N HESTER
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY
Date: February 01, 2022PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2021099090
Date: November 22, 2021SUMMONS NON SERVED - AMY N HESTER
Date: September 28, 2021JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022031379)
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF FILING - EXHIBITS
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE
Date: February 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT - COSTS
Date: February 10, 2022MOTION - ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: February 10, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 02, 2021SUMMONS SERVED - AMY N HESTER
Date: February 01, 2022DEFAULT - AMY N HESTER
Date: February 02, 2022SUMMONS ALIAS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AMY N HESTER
Date: November 22, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT - AMY N HESTER
Date: February 01, 2022NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL CORRESPONDENCE
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL
Date: September 02, 2021NOTICE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
Date: September 02, 2021COMPLAINT - COUNTY (SOUTH COUNTY)
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022031379) | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - EXHIBITS | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT - COSTS | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION - ENTRY OF FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
February 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON COMPLIANCE CORRESPONDENCE | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT - AMY N HESTER | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - AMY N HESTER | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT - AMY N HESTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.