Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Pardo, Yasel Perez, Riveron Estrada, Betsys Y, filed a(n) case represented by Diaz, Aristides, Diaz, Aristides Juan, Garcia, David, against American Integrity Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Vagnoni, Lauren, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with WALKER, STEPHEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWALKER, STEPHEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
NOTICE - INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 10, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: June 10, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 10, 2021RESPONSE - TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 12, 2021ORDER - SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 09, 2021NOTICE OF FILING - RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 23, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 24, 2021COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF FILING - VERIFICATION PAGE
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF FILING - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 23, 2021MOTION - DISMISS COUNT II OF COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAWS
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE - SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE - SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: August 06, 2021ORDER - GENERAL CASE DESIGNATION/CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
Date: August 02, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: July 14, 2021PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021050277
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: June 10, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE - TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER - SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 11/08/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN ZOOM , JDG: WALKER, STEPHEN | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - VERIFICATION PAGE | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION - DISMISS COUNT II OF COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAWS | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.