Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Collections Of Sarasota Inc, filed a(n) case represented by Valentine, Thomas C, against Ajc Jewels Inc, Nancy & David, Nancy & David Fine Jewels, Stone, David, Stone, Nancy, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with GOLDMAN, JUDITH M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOLDMAN, JUDITH M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 22, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Collections of Sarasota, Inc. against AJC Jewels, Inc., also known as Nancy & David Fine Jewels, Nancy Stone, and David Stone. The complaint alleges a breach of contract and guarantee. The plaintiff is seeking damages not e...
SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-NANCY STONE - ISSUED 05/23/2018
Date: May 22, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: May 22, 2018SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DAVID STONE - ISSUED 05/23/2018
Date: May 22, 2018NOTICE OF DISMISSAL
Date: October 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - DAVID STONE | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - AJC JEWELS INC D/B/A NANCY & DAVID FINE JEWELS A/K/A NANCY AND DAVID | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - NANCY STONE | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - AJC JEWELS INC D/B/A NANCY & DAVID FINE JEWELS A/K/A NANCY & DAVID- ISSUED 5/23/2018 | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-NANCY STONE - ISSUED 05/23/2018 | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS COUNTY EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-DAVID STONE - ISSUED 05/23/2018 | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS- PROPOSED-UNABLE TO ISSUE-MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.