Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pennymac Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Seiden, Jeffrey, against Colonial Oaks Of Sarasota Homeowners Association Inc, Hayes, Brittany A, Hayes, Cameron R, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with AREND, LON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
This complaint is a response from the defendant, Colonial Oaks of Sarasota Homeowners Association, Inc., to the plaintiff's verified complaint for foreclosure of mortgage. The defendant admits some of the allegations in the complaint for jurisdiction...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 02, 2017FORECLOSURE FORM A
Date: March 02, 2017NOTICE OF VALUE
Date: March 02, 2017COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99
Date: March 02, 2017LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2017026063)
Date: March 02, 2017NOTICE OF FILING-CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO FL. STATUTE 702.015
Date: March 02, 2017SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-BRITTANY A HAYES- ISSUED 3/3/2017
Date: March 02, 2017SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE-CAMERON R HAYES-ISSUED 3/3/2017
Date: March 02, 2017FORECLOSURE FORM B
Date: March 02, 2017PAYMENT $935.00 RECEIPT #2017021378
Date: March 02, 2017SUMMONS NON SERVED - CAMERON R. HAYES
Date: March 17, 2017SUMMONS SERVED - COLONIAL OAKS OF SARASOTA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC
Date: March 17, 2017SUMMONS NON SERVED - BRITTANY A HAYES
Date: March 17, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 31, 2017DEFENDANTS COLONIAL OAKS OF SARASOTA HOA INC REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 30, 2017NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM
Date: April 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION OR TERMINATION OF RMM PROGRAM | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS - FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS COLONIAL OAKS OF SARASOTA HOA INC RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS COLONIAL OAKS OF SARASOTA HOA INC NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS COLONIAL OAKS OF SARASOTA HOA INC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS COLONIAL OAKS OF SARASOTA HOA INC REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS NON SERVED - CAMERON R. HAYES | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED - COLONIAL OAKS OF SARASOTA HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS NON SERVED - BRITTANY A HAYES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.