Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Florida, filed a(n) case against Hitchman, Dunieski Joo, represented by Van Ness, Varinia, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with RIVA, DEBRA JOHNES presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
APPEAL - MANDATE - WITHOUT OPINION
Date: August 06, 2018APPEAL - ORDER / 16MM9116
Date: April 20, 2017APPEAL - ORDER DENYING APPELLEE'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
Date: June 28, 2017ANSWER BRIEF OF APPELLEE
Date: April 25, 2017REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
Date: April 25, 2017INITIAL BRIEF OF APPELLANT
Date: April 11, 2017APPEAL - ORDER
Date: March 30, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEAL - POST MANDATE | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEAL - RECEIPT TO V. VAN NESS, ESQ. | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEAL - RECEIPT TO D. PERAKIS, ESQ. | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEAL - RECEIPT TO B. YOUNG, ESQ. | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | APPEAL - MANDATE - WITHOUT OPINION | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ACTION: MANDATE AND OPINION SENT TO PARTIES VIA USPS / POST MANDATE FORWARDED TO JUDGE VIA INTER-OFFICE MAIL | |
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ACTION: FORWARDED MANDATE AND OPINION TO COURT FOR REVIEW VIA INTER-OFFICE MAIL | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | APPEAL - ORDER DENYING APPELLEE'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | OPINION ISSUED - APPEAL / REVERSED AND REMANDED | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ACTION: FORWARDED TO JUDGE RIVA - APPEAL REVIEW SHEET-AMENDED INITIAL BRIEF & ANSWER BRIEF-NO REPLY BRIEF FILED BY PARTIES. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.