Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Manno, Bryan, against Lewis, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with GALEN, PHYLLIS R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
ORDER ON WRIT
Date: June 26, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER ON STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE AND DISSOLVE CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT - FILED AND RECORDED (BOND PREVIOUSLY DISBURSED PER GARNISHEE'S ANSWER) - Recorded (OR. / 2013163923) | |
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISEE AND DISSOLVE THE CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
October 29, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE - FILED AND RECORDED ($100.00 PREVIOUSLY DISBURSED 7/25/2013) - Recorded (OR. / 2013147266) | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | ACTION: FORWARDED PROPOSED DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE TO JUDGE | |
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE | |
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST GARNISHEE BY COURT | |
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED - SARASOTA COUNTY HEALTH DEPARTMENT - SERVED | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED - SARASOTA COUNTY HEALTH DEPARTMENT - CORP SERVE: GINA DAMAIA - AFFIDAVIT OF LOST (ORIGINAL) SUMMONS ATTACHED | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.