Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Classic Builders Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kipp, Robert, against Goodless, Kirk, Minor, Jesse, represented by Sniffen, Charles, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with Sniffen, Charles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSniffen, Charles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2012 |
CategoryForeclosure - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a legal case filed by American Classic Builders, Inc., a Florida corporation, against Jesse Minor and Kirk Goodless. The complaint alleges that the defendants owe money to the plaintiff for construction work performed on their respe...
COMPLAINT - COUNTY RECEIPT: 752093 DATE: 06/18/2012
Date: June 18, 2012NOTICE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 30, 2012ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (JESSE MINOR AND KIRK GOODLESS)
Date: August 06, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS THE CAUSE OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE THE LIS PENDENS - FILED AND RECORDED | |
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROPOSED GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS THE CAUSE OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE THE LIS PENDENS | |
April 23, 2013 | Docket Event | JOINT MOTION - TO DISMISS THE CAUSE OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE THE LIS PENDENS | |
August 30, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE - DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
August 06, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (JESSE MINOR AND KIRK GOODLESS) | |
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - JESSE MINOR; KIRK GOODLESS ATTORNEY: SNIFFEN, CHARLES (0124907) | |
June 18, 2012 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - COUNTY RECEIPT: 752093 DATE: 06/18/2012 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.