Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Preferred Governmental Insurance Trust As Subr, filed a(n) case represented by Helm, George Adam Iii, against Eversole, Don Calvin, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with BOEHM, MARYANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBOEHM, MARYANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
JOINT STIPULATION
Date: May 21, 2013JOINT STIPULATION
Date: August 19, 2014ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT -STIPULATION
Date: September 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2014 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING AGREEMENT -STIPULATION | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROPOSED - ON APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION | |
August 19, 2014 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION | |
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 10/08/2014 AT 10:30 AM IN H , JDG: GOLDMAN, JUDITH M | |
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - PROPOSED SHOWING GOOD CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED | |
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL SENT ON: 05/01/2013 14:53:09 | |
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OF SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.