Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc Dba Mr Cooper, filed a(n) case represented by Vanhook, Nicholas, against Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By Through Un, Rivendell Community Association Inc, Tenant # 1, Tenant # 2, Tenant # 3, (total of 8) See All represented by Hicks, Jennifer, Olah, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with MCHUGH, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2011 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
RESPONSE - FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 09, 2020MOTION - TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT DUE TO FRAUD
Date: July 30, 2020AMENDED ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY APPELLATE COURT OF NEW APPEAL CASE - 2D20-3373
Date: November 30, 2020RESPONSE - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTON OF DOCUMENTS RELATING TO MOTION TO VACATE
Date: August 28, 2020ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY APPELLATE COURT OF NEW APPEAL CASE - 2D20-1291
Date: April 16, 2020APPEAL - ORDER - CONSOLIDATE - 2D20-3373 2D20-1291
Date: December 17, 2020RESPONSE - REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 09, 2020APPEAL - ORDER - 2D20-3373
Date: November 30, 2020ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY APPELLATE COURT OF NEW APPEAL CASE - CIVIL FINAL - 2D20-3373
Date: November 24, 2020ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D20-1291
Date: December 01, 2020APPEAL - ORDER - 2D20-1291
Date: November 23, 2020ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D20-1291
Date: September 17, 2020RESPONSE - TO POST-TRIAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - RELATED TO MOTION TO VACATE
Date: September 11, 2020APPEAL CORRESPONDENCE - 2D20-1291
Date: June 10, 2020REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 11, 2020MOTION TO WITHDRAW - CO COUNSEL
Date: June 24, 2020ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D20-1291
Date: August 26, 2020REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 20, 2020MOTION - CORRECT FINAL JUDGEMENT
Date: April 16, 2020APPEAL MANDATE & OPINION ISSUED ON APPEAL - DISMISSED - 2D19-3706
Date: April 21, 2020ORDER - DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 11, 2020ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D20-1291
Date: August 21, 2020ORDER SUPPLEMENTING APPEAL RECORD - 2D20-1291
Date: July 16, 2020ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D20-1291
Date: April 16, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL - FILED AND RECORDED - OF FINAL ORDER - Recorded (OR. / 2020050680)
Date: April 15, 2020ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: December 12, 2017MOTION - APPEAL - TO DISMISS
Date: June 25, 2020OBJECTION - TO MOTION TO VACATE
Date: August 01, 2020JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020037021)
Date: March 16, 2020ORDER - DENYING MOTION AMEND ANSWER
Date: March 11, 2020ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D20-1291
Date: June 12, 2020NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA
Date: July 06, 2017NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY
Date: July 05, 2016NOTICE OF FILING - SUBPOENA SERVED - FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION
Date: July 18, 2017ORDER SETTING TRIAL
Date: October 17, 2017ORDER ON NON-PARTY MOTION AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: December 12, 2017MOTION - IN LIMINE - DEFENDANT'S - INTRODUCING EVIDENCE
Date: March 06, 2020BRIEF - PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL
Date: March 09, 2020REQUEST - DEFENDANT FIFTH
Date: October 20, 2017RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: January 12, 2015MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: June 25, 2013NOTICE OF PRODUCTION - NON PARTY
Date: December 20, 2017NOTICE - OBJECTION TO SUBPOENA
Date: December 08, 2017MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 08, 2017ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: November 15, 2017ORDER - ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 15, 2017MOTION FOR REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: August 24, 2015MOTION - PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 25, 2017ORDER - CANCELLING SALE
Date: November 14, 2014MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL OF RECORD CLIENT CONSENT ATTACHED
Date: October 21, 2015DEFENDANT CHERI MELCHIONE'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 19, 2014MOTION - ENLARGMENT OF TIME
Date: December 24, 2014ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE
Date: January 20, 2016NOTICE OF PRODUCTION OF NON-PARTY
Date: June 24, 2016DEFENDANTS CHERI L MELCHIONES RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 18, 2014FORECLOSURE CORRESPONDENCE CANCEL SALE - 11/14/2014 SALE DATE - PER ORDER
Date: November 12, 2014REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ATTORNEY: LUBBECKE, CARMEN D (0344760)
Date: February 27, 2013ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL OF RECORD
Date: October 23, 2015MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF AND AMEND CASE STYLE-
Date: November 19, 2015OBJECTION - TO SUBPOENAS
Date: February 28, 2020MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: February 02, 2015PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 07, 2015MOTION - TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF AND AMEND CASE STYLE
Date: September 24, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - DEFENDANTS THIRD
Date: December 17, 2014ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D19-3706
Date: January 30, 2020MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 24, 2014DEFENDANT CHERI MELCHIONES AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: December 08, 2014APPEAL - ORDER - 2D20-3373
Date: November 24, 2020NOTICE OF APPEAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020164760)
Date: November 20, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: March 02, 2020LIST - TABLE OF AUTHORITIES
Date: March 01, 2020ORDER - DENYING MOTION TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT DUE TO FRAUD
Date: November 02, 2020MOTION - DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS - OR POST BOND
Date: November 06, 2020RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION STRIKE MOTION VACATE
Date: October 27, 2020ORDER - FOR RESPONSE
Date: October 26, 2020RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS
Date: December 15, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: February 26, 2020RESPONSE - OBJECTIONS FNMA SUBPOENAS
Date: February 28, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED00
Date: February 21, 2020ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D19-3706
Date: February 05, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: February 21, 2020MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: February 08, 2020ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL / 2D19-3706
Date: November 26, 2019MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: February 12, 2020MOTION - FOR STAY CHERI MELCHIONE (PRO-SE)
Date: September 27, 2019OBJECTION - SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY AND REQUEST VACATE ORDER
Date: January 14, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 09, 2020ORDER - DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ADD INDEPENSIBLE PARTY
Date: August 13, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT
Date: December 22, 2019ORDER - DENYING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS CASE OR ADD INDISPENSABLE PARTY
Date: August 13, 2019ORDER SETTING TRIAL - FORECLOSURE
Date: January 02, 2020NOTICE OF FILING - ORDER ON PETITIONER'S MOTION TO STAY
Date: December 12, 2019OBJECTION - DEFENDANTS
Date: January 21, 2020MOTION - TO COMPEL PRODUCTION
Date: January 07, 2020MOTION - SUMMARY JUDGMENT FAILURE TO JOIN AN INDESPENSIBLE PARTY
Date: January 17, 2020ORDER - SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLAINTIFF - AND AMENDING CASE STYLE
Date: October 10, 2019OBJECTION - MOTION FOR TRIAL
Date: December 13, 2019MOTION - RECONSIDERATION OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: December 31, 2019ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ON LEAVE TO ADD COUNTERCLAIM
Date: September 19, 2019ORDER - FOR RESPONSE
Date: October 24, 2019ORDER - DENYING STAY
Date: May 22, 2019MOTION - RESET TRIAL DATE
Date: January 07, 2020ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS / 2D19-3706
Date: October 11, 2019ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL / 2D19-3706
Date: December 26, 2019ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS / 2D19-3706
Date: October 10, 2019OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF
Date: September 30, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019133798)
Date: September 27, 2019ORDER -DENYING MOTION TO STAY DURING CERTIORARI PROCEEDINGS
Date: October 10, 2019APPEAL - ORDER - 2D19-3706
Date: October 01, 2019ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS / 2D19-3706
Date: December 11, 2019ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS / 2D19-3706
Date: September 26, 2019ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY APPELLATE COURT OF NEW APPEAL CASE / 2D19-3706
Date: September 26, 2019OBJECTION - TO MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF
Date: August 02, 2019RESPONSE - TO DEFT PRODUCTION REQUEST
Date: December 04, 2012RESPONSE REQUEST ADMISSIONS
Date: March 22, 2013MOTION EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 21, 2013REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 30, 2012STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: April 23, 2013ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE
Date: January 17, 2013RESPONSE - TO DEFT CHERI L MELCHIONE'S SECOND PRODUCTION REQUEST
Date: March 27, 2013DEFENDANT CHERI MELCHIONE’S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 30, 2012DEFENDANT CHRI MELCHIONE'S DEMAND FOR FDCPA INFORMATION
Date: August 30, 2012MOTION EXTENSION TIME
Date: September 18, 2012AFFIDAVIT OPPOSITION MOTION
Date: September 27, 2012RESPONSE - TO DEFT PRODUCTION REQUEST
Date: November 05, 2012ANSWER - THE WOODLANDS PATIO HOMES I AT RIVENDELL ASSOCIATION, INC.
Date: June 07, 2012REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 06, 2012ORDER - RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE - MOTION DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 19, 2013PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDNAT(S) CHERI MELCHONE'S AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: June 26, 2012MOTION - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 06, 2019RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ON LEAVE TO ADD COUNTERCLAIM
Date: September 17, 2019MOTION - TO DISMISS CASE AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS - CHERI MELCHIONE
Date: May 21, 2019MOTION - TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: December 20, 2019MOTION TO WITHDRAW - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ILLEGALITY
Date: January 07, 2020OBJECTION - AMENDED OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ADD INDISPENSABLE PARTY
Date: August 07, 2019APPEAL - ORDER - 2D19-3706
Date: January 09, 2020MOTION - COMPEL - SANCTIONS
Date: April 30, 2019MOTION- TO DISMISS CASE AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: May 31, 2019MOTION - TO ADD INDISPENSABLE PARTY
Date: August 02, 2019MOTION - CORRECT ORDER
Date: August 21, 2019MOTION TO WITHDRAW - RECONSIDERATION OF STAY
Date: January 21, 2020ORDER - GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY
Date: July 22, 2019RESPONSE - OPPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR RULING
Date: June 06, 2019ORDER - DENYING SHOW CAUSE ORDER ENTERED ON MAY 8, 2019
Date: July 22, 2019ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: July 22, 2019ORDER - DENYING STAY PROCEEDING
Date: May 22, 2019RESPONSE - TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER - DEFT
Date: July 16, 2019ORDER - ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS CASE AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: June 10, 2019ORDER - DENYING MOTION COMPEL AND SANCTIONS
Date: May 22, 2019MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS
Date: May 09, 2019ORDER - SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 09, 2019RESPONSE - TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: September 18, 2019MOTION - COMPEL PRODUCTION FOR APO RELATED DOCUMENTS
Date: July 16, 2019ORDER - GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: July 22, 2019OBJECTION - TO MAGISTRATE REFERRAL
Date: May 17, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: June 05, 2019ORDER - ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ADD COUNTERCLAIMS
Date: September 05, 2019MOTION - RECONSIDERATION
Date: August 02, 2019MOTION - ADD INDISPENSIBLE PARTY
Date: July 15, 2019MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIAFF AND AMEND CASE STYLE
Date: August 01, 2019MOTION - LEAVE OF THE COURT TO ADD COUNTERCLAIMS
Date: July 17, 2019MOTION - RECONSIDERATION
Date: September 13, 2019RESPONSE - MOTION TO SHOW CAUSE - DEFENDANT
Date: July 16, 2019MOTION - FOR MEDIATION
Date: April 26, 2019MOTION - AMENDED - DISMISS CASE OR ADD INDISPENSIBLE PARTY
Date: July 16, 2019NOTICE OF SCHEDULING MEDIATION
Date: March 12, 2019MOTION - AMENDED - DISMISS FAILURE TO ADD INDESPENSIBLE PARTY (FNMA)
Date: July 16, 2019MOTION - TO STRIKE AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 25, 2019MOTION - FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 06, 2019MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: May 08, 2019ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COURT TO RESOLVE "APO" DOCUMENT DISPUTE
Date: May 01, 2019NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA
Date: September 06, 2018MOTION TO APPROVE DEFENDANT'S THIRD SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: November 06, 2018ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR THE DEFENDANT
Date: November 13, 2018MOTION FOR MEDIATION
Date: November 07, 2018MOTION - VACATE - AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 31, 2018ORDER - DENYING MOTION COMPEL PRODUCTION AND SANCTIONS
Date: February 25, 2019OBJECTION AND REQUEST TO DISMISS
Date: January 30, 2019ORDER - ON MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER - DENYING MOTION DISMISS
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER - DENYING MOTION VACATE PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: February 25, 2019ORDER - ON MOTION FOR MEDIATION
Date: February 25, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT
Date: October 26, 2018MOTION - COURT TO RESOLVE APO DOCUMENTS DISPUTE
Date: February 28, 2019ORDER - DENYING MOTION APPROVE THIRD SET INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 25, 2019MOTION - TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF AND AMEND CASE STYLE
Date: April 04, 2019REPORT - MEDIATOR
Date: April 03, 2019MOTION - TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND SANCTIONS
Date: October 01, 2018SUBPOENA - BANK OF AMERICA NA
Date: September 06, 2018NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVITS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: August 20, 2018MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OJBECTIONS TO SUBPOENA
Date: April 19, 2018ORDER SETTING TRIAL
Date: March 20, 2018MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD
Date: April 26, 2018ORDER - GRANTING WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL
Date: August 15, 2018MOTION - VACATE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: August 08, 2018OBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY
Date: April 08, 2019MOTION - TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 01, 2019ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: April 24, 2018ORDER OVERRULING NOTICE OF OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION
Date: March 06, 2018ORDER SETTING TRIAL
Date: September 18, 2018RESPONSE - TO DEFENDANT'S FIFTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 05, 2018MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: September 19, 2018ORDER SETTING TRIAL
Date: March 06, 2018NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO RELIEVE WITNESS
Date: September 18, 2018NOTICE OF ISSUANCE OF SUBPOENA
Date: September 20, 2018ORDER - PROPOSED
Date: March 15, 2018ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: March 06, 2018MOTION - TO RELIEVE WITNESS FROM TRIAL
Date: August 20, 2018AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: January 02, 2018JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: May 08, 2014MOTION - AMEND ANSWERS, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS - CHERI MELCHIONE
Date: October 15, 2018ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: May 15, 2014MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: July 22, 2013JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014120906)
Date: October 09, 2014OBJECTION - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION
Date: January 02, 2018ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: July 23, 2013MOTION - WITHDRAW
Date: October 02, 2018AMENDED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: May 15, 2012OBJECTION TO ATTORNEY WITHDRAWAL - CHERI MELCHIONE
Date: August 10, 2018REQUEST - AMENDED - BORROWER - TO PARTICIPATE IN RMFM PROGRAM
Date: January 30, 2012RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 31, 2016MOTION - DEFT MELCHIONE, CHERI L - TO DISMISS
Date: January 30, 2012MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: November 10, 2014ANSWER - CHERI MELCHIONE
Date: December 01, 2011MOTION - DISMISS - MELCHIONE, CHERI L
Date: February 06, 2012DEFENDANT CHIRI L. MELCHIONE'S FOURTH REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: April 29, 2016REQUEST - FOR COSTS BOND
Date: January 30, 2012ASSIGNMENT OF BID
Date: October 30, 2014AGREED ORDER DISPENSING WITH CONCILIATION
Date: March 29, 2016REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - TO PTLF - FOR MEDIATION
Date: January 30, 2012NOTICE OF FILING - AMENDED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT
Date: May 15, 2012REQUEST - AMENDED BORROWER - FOR MEDIATION
Date: February 06, 2012NOTICE - OF DEFENDANTS' WITHDRAWAL OF RESPONSE FILED DECEMBER 1, 2011
Date: April 05, 2012ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: February 25, 2019ANSWER - AMENDED - AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS - CHERI MELCHIONE
Date: March 06, 2019MOTION - FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS AND DEFENSES
Date: January 27, 2020MOTION - CORRECTED - LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWERS AND DEFENSES - DEFENDANT
Date: March 01, 2020APPEAL POST MANDATE FORWARDED TO JUDGE - 2D19-3706
Date: April 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | APPEAL - ORDER - CONSOLIDATE - 2D20-3373 2D20-1291 | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 18 2021 3:30PM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Feb 9 2021 2:30PM JUDGE: MCHUGH, ANDREA LOCATION: JACS | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 7 2021 2:00PM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | DOCKET LINE ERROR - DOCUMENT CONTAINS INCORRECT LOWER TRIBUNAL CASE NUMBER - S/B 2013 CA 004030 NC | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | *** CANCELLED - COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 7 2021 2:00PM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Jan 7 2021 1:30PM JUDGE: BAILEY, DEBORAH LOCATION: JACS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.