Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carroll, Jessica Anastasia, State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) case against Lindo, Ronald A, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with PADAR, DONNA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OF WITHDRAWAL MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT MEMORANDUM | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT HISTORY | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | QUESTIONNAIRE SUPPORT- RESPONDENT | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: APR 12 2019 9:00AM JUDGE: DEMEDIO, GLORIA LOCATION: JACS | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - INCOME DEDUCTION - INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT ORDER AND FLORIDA ADDENDUM | |
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - SUPPORT - FINDING AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF HEARING OFFICER AND ORDER ON MOTION TO REDIRECT SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.