Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citation 320 Delaware Llc A Limited Liability Corp, filed a(n) case represented by Lucrezi, Cathy Louise, against Bishop, Vanessa, Holland, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with DENKIN, DAVID LEE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED RAYMOND HOLLAND | |
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED VANESSA BISHOP | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2014072529) | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - RAYMOND HOLLAND | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - VANESSA BISHOP | |
April 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 06/17/2014 AT 11:00 AM IN 7B , JDG: DENKIN, DAVID LEE | |
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - VANESSA BISHOP | |
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - RAYMOND HOLLAND | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - RAYMOND HOLLAND HANDED TO PROCESS SERVER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.