Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kim, David J, Kim, Deborah Y, filed a(n) case against King, Derrick J, Smith, Danielle, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts with SOUTH COUNTY CIVIL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSOUTH COUNTY CIVIL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2005 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT FILED & RECORDED
Date: December 07, 2005Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2005 | Docket Event | WRIT RETURNED | |
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY DEFAULT | |
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - FINAL JUDGMENT FILED & RECORDED | |
December 07, 2005 | Docket Event | WRIT ISSUED/ GAVE TO PLTF | |
December 05, 2005 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT: DERRICK J KING & DANIELLE SMITH & DEFAULT -ENTERED | |
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - DANIELLE SMITH | |
November 28, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED - DERRICK J KING | |
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - EVICTION SENT ON: 11/21/2005 13:24:04 | |
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION RECEIPT: 273820 DATE: 11/21/2005 | |
November 21, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: AS TO BOTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.