Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Blackburn, Kelly, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Blackburn, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Santa Rosa County, FL, . Santa Rosa County, FL Superior Courts with CLIFTON DRAKE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 46-E |
Last RefreshedSeptember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Rosa County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JAMES CRAWFORD JR, ESQ OBO KELLY | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JOSEPH BLACKBURN 9/13/22 OKALOOSA COUNTY TEMPORARY INJUCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO RETURN | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Cover Sheet - EMAILED TO OKALOOSA COUNTY | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE 572022DR001514DRAXMX FILED WITH CLERK ON 9/13/2022 | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE: ASSIGNED | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGE: DUNCAN , JAMES SCOTT ASSIGNED | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION 9/28/2022 @8:15AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.