Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Traffic: Adult case against Guzman, Oscar, in the jurisdiction of Merced County. This case was filed in Merced County Superior Courts with Donabed, Monika presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2019 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMerced County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Arraignment
Date: October 21, 2020Arraignment
Date: January 12, 2021Arraignment
Date: January 26, 2021Arraignment
Date: May 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Waived Counsel | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Payment Plan
Judge: Donabed, Monika |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment Judge: Donabed, Monika |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Charges and Direct Consequence of Plea | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Right to Trial by Jury Waived | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment
Judge: Foster, David |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Revised FTA Courtesy Notice FTA - 10 Day Collection Notice |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Criminal: Minute Order Arraignment Judge: Foster, David |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Case to Proceed to Collections |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.