Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rowe, Tammy, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with ISENHOWER, DARYL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeISENHOWER, DARYL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2024 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a legal case filed by Plaintiff MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. against Defendant TAMMY ROWE in the County Court of the Nineteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Saint Lucie County, Florida. The action is for damages that do not exceed...
COMPLAINT
Date: March 01, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 04, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 01, 2024NOTICE STANDARD ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS
Date: March 04, 2024SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: March 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE STANDARD ZOOM INSTRUCTIONS | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2024000018125 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 193077704 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20240304235959.TXT. | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 04/08/2024 AT 1:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: GREEN, JOHAN A ASSIGNED | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: GREEN, JOHAN A - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2024SC000814, MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. VS. ROWE, TAMMY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-3/4/2024" | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.