Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
First Protective Insurance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Martelli, Jennifer, Martelli, Michael, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with LEVIN, STEVEN J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 25, 2024 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
The legal document involves a complaint filed by First Protective Insurance Company against Michael and Jennifer Martelli in St. Lucie County, Florida, regarding property damage from Hurricane Ian. The complaint seeks the appointment of an umpire for...
SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 01, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 25, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2024SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: March 25, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: MITCHELL, WILLIAM MATTHEW SR - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2024CA000523, FIRST PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY VS. MARTELLI, MICHAEL - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-4/1/2024" | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2024000026029 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 194777205 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20240401235959.TXT. | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MITCHELL, WILLIAM MATTHEW SR ASSIGNED | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/25/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024CA000523 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.