Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Johnstone, Margaret L, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Johnstone, Robert M, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with LEVIN, STEVEN J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This document is a petition to enforce a foreign power of attorney. Margaret L. Johnstone, the wife and agent of Robert M. Johnstone, seeks authorization to sell their properties in Florida due to Robert's chronic Vascular Dementia. The power of atto...
NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 05, 2024PETITION TO ENFORCE FOREIGN POWER OF ATTORNEY
Date: December 13, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 01/18/2024 AT 9:30 AM IN 3E/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: LEVIN, STEVEN J | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE LEVIN, STEVEN J: ASSIGNED | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION TO ENFORCE FOREIGN POWER OF ATTORNEY | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE SCHWAB, CHARLES A: ASSIGNED | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: SIMMONS, EVETT LOUISE ASSIGNED | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/13/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CA002873 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.