Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Mia, Shelina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Cash, James M, Cheney Brothers Inc., in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with WARONICKI, BRETT M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: March 22, 2023NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: April 23, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 22, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: LOUTOS, CASSIDY LEIGH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2023CA001310, MIA, SHELINA VS. CASH, JAMES M - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMMTBI-3/22/2023" | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023000025905 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 169336654 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230327235959.TXT. | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: LOUTOS, CASSIDY LEIGH ASSIGNED | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/22/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023CA001310 | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE WARONICKI, BRETT M: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.