Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ekwegh, Heather Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Marano, Jennifer, Marano, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with WARONICKI, BRETT M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWARONICKI, BRETT M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT
Date: March 22, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 22, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 30, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 30, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 03, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: March 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2023000028487 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 169996356 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230403235959.TXT. | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: CALAMUSA, STEVEN G - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2023CA001236, EKWEGH, HEATHER MARIA VS. MARANO, JENNIFER - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-4/3/2023" | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023000025396 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 169399746 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20230324235959.TXT. | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: CALAMUSA, STEVEN G ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.