Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Orthopedic Center Of Florida, Inc, filed a(n) case against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with ISENHOWER, DARYL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2023NOTICE STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM
Date: December 21, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 20, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 21, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: December 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2022000097035 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 163387629 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20221221235959.TXT. | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: GUDIN, GREGORY EDWARD ASSIGNED | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/06/2023 AT 2:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: GUDIN, GREGORY EDWARD - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022SC004608, ORTHOPEDIC CENTER OF FLORIDA, INC VS. ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-12/21/2022; NTC-12/21/2022" | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.