Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Brenenson, Rose, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with ISENHOWER, DARYL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED
Date: July 09, 2022NOTICE/STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM/VIRTUAL
Date: July 01, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: July 01, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: June 29, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 29, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: August 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
July 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE/STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM/VIRTUAL | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 08/01/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022000051056 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 152407529 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20220701235959.TXT. | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: CULLEN, STEVEN PAUL ASSIGNED | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: CULLEN, STEVEN PAUL - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022SC002154, PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC VS. BRENENSON, ROSE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-7/1/2022,NCICL-7/1/2022" | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIALITY CLARIFICATION LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.