Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Raffaeli, Denise, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mondesir, Marie, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with COX, CYNTHIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, CYNTHIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | DOR HEARING SET FOR 05/08/2023 AT 8:45 AM IN 2A/ , HEARING OFFICER: MCHUGH, ELIZABETH | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE PEGG, ROBERT L: ASSIGNED | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED | |
February 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney HERNAN CASTRO - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD JR: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.