Case Last Refreshed: 4 days ago
Hamel-Sheremeta, Jessica Gabrielle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sheremeta, Justin, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with COX, CYNTHIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, CYNTHIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO PROPERTY OR DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 04/23/2024 AT 9:00 AM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: NORMAN, ANASTASIA | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING | |
December 26, 2023 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: NORMAN, ANASTASIA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022DR001680, HAMEL-SHEREMETA, JESSICA GABRIELLE VS. SHEREMETA, JUSTIN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MDIS-12/15/2023" | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR OTHER-NON IVD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.