Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Panchana, Nathaly, Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Walker, Keydrum Bernard Jr, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with COX, CYNTHIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, CYNTHIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedJune 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022DR000965, PANCHANA, NATHALY VS. WALKER, KEYDRUM BERNARD JR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MTH-6/7/2023" | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: PEGG, ROBERT L - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022DR000965, PANCHANA, NATHALY VS. WALKER, KEYDRUM BERNARD JR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MTH-6/7/2023" | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DOR HEARING SET FOR 06/20/2023 AT 8:45 AM IN 2A/ , HEARING OFFICER: MCHUGH, ELIZABETH | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE PEGG, ROBERT L: ASSIGNED | |
May 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR OTHER-IVD | |
May 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.