Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lessne, Steven A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lessne, Dahlia C, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRIFFIN, VICTORIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 01/23/2023 AT 11:00 AM IN VTR/ , MAGISTRATE: EWEN, LILLIAN BOUDRIAS | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD JR: ASSIGNED | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - CIVIL | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022DR000083, LESSNE, STEVEN A VS. LESSNE, DAHLIA C - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MSA-12/23/2022" | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) - RECORDED (OTHER.4931.1856. / 5136824) | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR OTHER-NON IVD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.