Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case against Crawford, Mary Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with ROBY, WILLIAM L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
|
MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: April 18, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY
Date: March 11, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 13, 2022DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI
Date: March 15, 2022WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY
Date: February 10, 2022INFORMATION
Date: February 08, 2022DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: February 10, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 21, 2022FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD
Date: January 18, 2022UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION
Date: January 20, 2022ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE
Date: January 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 04/19/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH ASSIGNED | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: MOSHER, EDWARD JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022CF000118 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. CRAWFORD, MARY ELIZABETH - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-4/13/2022" | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.