Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rra Cp Opportunity Trust 2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Green Pines Port St. Lucie Section Forty-Seven Property Owners Association Inc, Mayorga, Khandra R, Mayorga, Marcio, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Old Republic National Title Insurance Company, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with BELANGER, ROBERT E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: June 30, 2022DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 28, 2022ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND SUBSTITUTING CROSSCLAIMANT
Date: April 11, 2023RETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS
Date: April 13, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED- MARCIO
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER / AFFIR' DEFENSES & TO ADD COUNTER/CROSS CLAIMS
Date: September 20, 2022SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK
Date: June 28, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT 2
Date: June 30, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2022VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY
Date: June 28, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - (MERS ROCKET MORTGAGE)
Date: July 07, 2022MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ADD CROSSCLAIMS - APRIL & RICKY
Date: August 17, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - MERS (ROCKET MORTGAGE)
Date: June 30, 2022LIS PENDENS
Date: June 28, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING -AMENDED
Date: August 31, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - GREEN PINE PORT ST LUCIE SEC 47
Date: June 30, 2022REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 09, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - KHANDRA
Date: July 12, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO CROSS-CLAIM
Date: November 28, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - LOANCARE CUSTODIAN
Date: October 07, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 13, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED - UNK TEN 1
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - MERS ROCKET MORTGAGE
Date: July 26, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 28, 2022ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE COMMISSION FOR DEPOSITION
Date: September 20, 2022CIVIL CASE MANGMENT PLAN
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION - LOANCARE CUSTODIAN
Date: November 01, 2022ANSWER - RICKY AND APRIL PATTERSON
Date: July 18, 2022REPLY IN WAY OF AVOIDANCE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: September 16, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - APRIL
Date: June 30, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION-AMENDED (LOANCARE CUSTODIAN)
Date: October 07, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN TENANT 1
Date: June 30, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - APRIL
Date: July 12, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - GREEN PINES
Date: July 12, 2022LIS PENDENS - RECORDED (OR.4851.2618. / 5063737)
Date: July 07, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: June 28, 2022NOTICE OF INTENT TO OBTAIN A COMMISSION FOR OUT-OF-STATE DEPO - APRIL & RICKY
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - APRIL & RICKY
Date: July 26, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 31, 2022ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - MERS
Date: August 26, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 16, 2022CORRESPONDENCE
Date: September 20, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE - APRIL & RICKY
Date: August 17, 2022ORDER APPROVING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: September 14, 2022MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT/EXTENSION OF TIME - MERS ROCKET MORTGAGE
Date: July 26, 2022REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - LOANCARE CUSTODIAN
Date: October 27, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - MARCIO
Date: June 30, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED - RICKY
Date: June 30, 2022MOTION TO DISMISS - MARCIO & KHANDRA
Date: August 10, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED - UNK TEN 2
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER TO EXTEND TIME - AMENDED
Date: August 09, 2022SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Date: October 07, 2022ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 02, 2022OTHER - COMMISSION TO BE ISSUED - AMENDED
Date: September 30, 2022OTHER - COMMISSION ISSUED - AMENDED
Date: September 30, 2022NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - AMENDED
Date: March 03, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED - KHANDRA
Date: June 30, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED - RICKY
Date: July 12, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: November 22, 2022COURT NOTES
Date: September 19, 2022REPLY
Date: December 07, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES - APRIL & RICKY
Date: August 17, 2022MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF COMMISSION FOR DEPO - APRIL & RICKY
Date: August 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND SUBSTITUTING CROSSCLAIMANT - RECORDED (OTHER.5011.1191. / 5211995) | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney VICTOR H VESCHIO - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney DOMINIC JOHN SCALERA III - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney DREW P O'MALLEY - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney PETER ARMOLD - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $395.00 RECEIPT #2023000032514 | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CIV CROSS CLAIM ASSESSED $395.00 | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN PLEADING FORM - MISSING DOCUMENTS | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: ARMOLD, PETER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022CA001168, RRA CP OPPORTUNITY TRUST 2 VS. PATTERSON, APRIL Y - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: RETP-4/13/2023" | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND SUBSTITUTING CROSSCLAIMANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.