Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Dragutsky, Jason Scott, against Ruiz, Julisa, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with ISENHOWER, DARYL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeISENHOWER, DARYL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
COMPLAINT
Date: March 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/11/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021SC000948 | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT ASSIGNED | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: DRAGUTSKY, JASON SCOTT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021SC000948, CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS. RUIZ, JULISA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NTC-3/11/2021,SUMI-3/11/2021" | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 04/26/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN VTR/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE-STANDARD INSTRUCTIONS FOR ZOOM HEARING | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021000019841 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 122879832 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20210311235959.TXT. | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.