Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lester, Consquela S, filed a(n) case against Reynolds, Azariah, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with Cynthia L. Cox presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia L. Cox Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD JR: ASSIGNED | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 01/10/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BAUER, SHERWOOD JR | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | PAY STUBS FILED | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.