Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Levasseur, Erik filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bennett, Robert E, represented by Smith, Stephen Palmer, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with ALONZO, EDMOND W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALONZO, EDMOND W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Traffic |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
SUBPOENA ISSUED - ELECTRONICALLY NOTIFIED
Date: November 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT, DOREEN REGENT STANDING IN FOR STEPHEN P. SMITH AND HAS APPEARED FOR THE DEFENDANT, OFC E. LEVASSEUR WAS NOT PRESENT. DEFENSE ENTERED A PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE TO CT.1 SPEED/SCHOOL ZONE (316.1895). OFFICER HARRIS STAND-IN. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 ADJ W/H COURT-JUDGE : PAY WITHIN 45 DAYS, DUE DATE 1/15/2021, OR SUSPEND LICENSE. FINE INCLUDES COURT COSTS. PAY: WIT SUBPOENA TR CASES $7.00; SCHOOLZONE $456.00; BALANCE DUE = $463.00 . | |
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event | DRIVER LICENSE CHECK | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED - ELECTRONICALLY NOTIFIED | |
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADJHZSE | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC NON-JURY TRIAL - OTHER SET FOR 12/01/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN K/ , MAGISTRATE: TRAFFIC MAGISTRATE | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR EMAILED TO ATTORNEY (DEFENDANT) | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: SMITH, STEPHEN PALMER ASSIGNED | |
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: SMITH, STEPHEN PALMER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2020TR022796 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BENNETT, ROBERT E - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NTA-10/15/2020" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.