Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, Citibank N A, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Baena Paez, Ida Angela, Moehle, Kristina B, against Bell, Kaitlin R, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with ISENHOWER, DARYL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeISENHOWER, DARYL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
COMPLAINT
Date: October 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: MOEHLE, KRISTINA B ASSIGNED | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: BAENA PAEZ, IDA ANGELA ASSIGNED | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE ISENHOWER, DARYL: ASSIGNED | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2020000069782 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 114258062 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20201002235959.TXT. | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: BAENA PAEZ, IDA ANGELA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2020SC002970, CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS. BELL, KAITLIN R - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-10/2/2020" | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/23/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN L/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: BAENA PAEZ, IDA ANGELA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2020SC002970, CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS. BELL, KAITLIN R - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NCICL-10/2/2020" | |
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIALITY CLARIFICATION LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.