Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Farach, Paige Meredith, against Knapp, Steven Lee, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with HENDRIKS, JEFFREY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENDRIKS, JEFFREY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2020 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )
Date: November 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION ( V ) | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND US21017492 (893.13.6B) RELEASED | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: FARACH, PAIGE MEREDITH ASSIGNED | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: DIAZ, CHRISTOPHER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2020MM002219 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. KNAPP, STEVEN LEE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-12/8/2020" | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND US21017493 (893.147.1-3) RELEASED | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: DIAZ, CHRISTOPHER - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2020MM002219 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. KNAPP, STEVEN LEE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-11/19/2020" | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
November 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.