Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portilla Hernandez, Ana M, Department Of Revenue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hernandez Ponciano, Adrian Abel, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with MCCANN, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedMay 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | DOR HEARING SET FOR 05/10/2022 AT 1:45 PM IN VTR/ , HEARING OFFICER: MCHUGH, ELIZABETH | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT-IVD | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | FAMILY COURT COVER SHEET | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELIQUENCY - RECORDED (OTHER.4791.1214. / 5009373) | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELIQUENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.