Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Haynes, Cody, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Frew, Tara, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with MCCANN, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONCLUSION OF REPRESENTATION ( V ) | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY ( V ) | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V ) | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE ( V ) | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ( V ) | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V ) | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE ( V ) | |
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V ) | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.