Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Fabre Blanc, Wideline Louis Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Blanc, Edward Lamy, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with COX, CYNTHIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, CYNTHIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ARREARS | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 09/07/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 1B/ , MAGISTRATE: EWEN, LILLIAN B | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - CIVIL | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT-NON IVD | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT (NON DOR) | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DRIVERS LICENSE COPY | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2023000055367 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.