Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Banks, Monique, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Chaney, Darry, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with COX, CYNTHIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, CYNTHIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 2019 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 11:45 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: COX, CYNTHIA L | |
October 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( V ) | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V ) | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ( V ) | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: CASTRO, HERNAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2019DR002805, BANKS, MONIQUE VS. CHANEY, DARRY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-8/3/2020" | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V ) | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V ) | |
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: CASTRO, HERNAN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2019DR002805, BANKS, MONIQUE VS. CHANEY, DARRY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-2/26/2020" |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.