Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Holloman, Felicia, against Gentles, Inekia Twanna, represented by Couzens, Steven Edward, Rosenberg, Regan M, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET ( V ) | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT ( V ) | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT NOTES | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING SET FOR 04/07/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT IN OPEN COURT IN JAIL. APD R.ROSENBERG AND ASA F.HOLLOMAN WERE PRESENT VIA ZOOM.CASE SET FOR CHANGE OF PLEA ON 04/07/2021 AT 9:30AM. KA/KB/DC | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL DOCKET SET FOR 03/02/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 03/01/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ( V ) | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | TRIAL DOCKET SET FOR 03/01/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: DOCKET CALL: DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT, IN CUSTODY. APD R. ROSENBERG AND ASA F. HOLLOMAN WAS PRESENT VIA ZOOM. ANNOUNCED READY FOR TRIAL. CASE SET FOR TRIAL DOCKET CALL ON 03/01/2021 AT 09:30 AM. KD/KB/DC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.