Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Holloman, Felicia, against Garcia, Samuel, represented by Bernard, Paul Barnett, Dominguez, Lizet, Office Of Criminal Conflict And Civil Regional Counsel, Schaefer, Christine Roleke, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2019 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: July 16, 2019NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: August 02, 2019REQUEST ( V )
Date: June 10, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )
Date: October 01, 2019DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )
Date: September 04, 2019DEMAND FOR COPY OF INFORMATION ( V )
Date: August 26, 2019ORDER APPT COUNSEL/CONFLICT COUNSEL/REGIONAL COUNSEL ( V )
Date: August 22, 2019PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V ) ( V )
Date: July 13, 2019MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )
Date: August 21, 2019REQUEST
Date: April 03, 2020JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )
Date: October 08, 2019JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4332.432 / 4627998) ( V )
Date: October 11, 2019TRANSFER CASE LETTER
Date: August 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | COLLECTION COURT HEARING SET FOR 10/25/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN M/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR COLLECTION COURT | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST ( V ) | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNPAID JUDGMENT/FEES SENT | |
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney FELICIA HOLLOMAN - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4334.2181 / 4630746) ( V ) | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4332.432 / 4627998) ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.