Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Long, William Crawford, against Collado, Gabriel, represented by Radcliffe, Gabrielle Lucie Antonia, Ziskinder, Steven, Dominguez, Lizet, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2019 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: ZISKINDER, STEVEN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2019CF000651 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. COLLADO, GABRIEL - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-3/29/2021" | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO CONTINUE ( V ) | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 05/18/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CONTINUE ( V ) | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: ZISKINDER, STEVEN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2019CF000651 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. COLLADO, GABRIEL - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-3/24/2021" | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 04/01/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: ZISKINDER, STEVEN - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2019CF000651 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. COLLADO, GABRIEL - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-3/9/2021" | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.