Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Charlet, Christina N, against Dostal, Robert, Motorcoach Marketing International Inc, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with BELANGER, ROBERT E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBELANGER, ROBERT E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )
Date: October 31, 2018COMPLAINT ( V )
Date: October 31, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )
Date: October 31, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )
Date: November 01, 2018SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )
Date: November 13, 2018NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )
Date: December 14, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )
Date: December 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney CHRISTINA N. CHARLET - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V ) | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V ) | |
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V ) | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V ) | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ( V ) | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2018000083782 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 80131898 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20181101235959.TXT. | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE BELANGER, ROBERT E: ASSIGNED | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: CHARLET, CHRISTINA N. ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.