Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dittmar, Wendy Diane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dittmar, Jeffrey Scott, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with SCHWAB, CHARLES A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHWAB, CHARLES A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2017 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2020000041627 | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney DAVID MILO LAMOS - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney KAREN OBRIEN STEGER - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) ( V ) SENT EMAIL TO CHILD SUPPORT 9/29/17 - Recorded (Other.4047.237 / 4355073) ( V ) | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2017DR001137, DITTMAR, WENDY DIANE VS. DITTMAR, JEFFREY SCOTT - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFFJDGDOMWMC-9/28/2017,MEMO-9/28/2017" | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM ( V ) | |
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED) ( V ) SENT EMAIL TO CHILD SUPPORT 9/29/17 | |
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | UNIFORM MOTION CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR 09/28/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.