Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fife, Samantha Nicole, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bobko, George Max Jr, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with MCCANN, JAMES presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCCANN, JAMES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2017 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE HEISEY, MICHAEL C: ASSIGNED | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL ( V ) | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 01/07/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: HEISEY, MICHAEL C | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( V ) | |
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE MCCANN, JAMES W: ASSIGNED | |
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | UNIFORM MOTION CALENDAR HEARING SET FOR 05/03/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.