Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mansoor, Nusrat, Travieso, Jennifer, against Department Of The Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Grindley, Andrea, Grindley, Phillip, Uknown Tenant 1, Uknown Tenant 2, (total of 7) See All represented by Austin, Brooke Davis, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with BELANGER, ROBERT E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBELANGER, ROBERT E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2017 |
CategoryHomestead Mf $50,001-$249,999 |
Last RefreshedJuly 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )
Date: February 28, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )
Date: February 28, 2017VALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY ( V )
Date: February 28, 2017LIS PENDENS ( V )
Date: February 28, 2017COMPLAINT ( V )
Date: February 28, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )
Date: February 28, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED-SERVICEMAIL@ALDRIDGEPITE.COM ( V )
Date: March 01, 2017LIS PENDENS - Recorded (Other.3968.1660 / 4282402) ( V )
Date: March 01, 2017RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )
Date: March 21, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )
Date: March 21, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ( V )
Date: March 24, 2017SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED ( V )
Date: March 24, 2017MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )
Date: April 03, 2017MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )
Date: April 12, 2017MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )
Date: June 15, 2017MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )
Date: April 24, 2017MOTION FOR DEFAULT ( V )
Date: May 15, 2017DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ( V )
Date: May 15, 2017NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ( V )
Date: May 15, 2017NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY ( V )
Date: May 15, 2017DEFAULTS ENTERED (3 ) ( V )
Date: May 17, 2017ORDER TO EXTEND TIME ( V )
Date: May 17, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )
Date: July 11, 2017NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V )
Date: August 03, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )
Date: September 22, 2017NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V )
Date: September 22, 2017NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4044.1846 / 4352832) ( V )
Date: September 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney BROOKE DAVIS AUSTIN - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney NUSRAT MANSOOR - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
September 26, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4044.1846 / 4352832) ( V ) | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $18.50 RECEIPT #2017000070655 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 61869559 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20170925235959.TXT. | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V ) | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ( V ) | |
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION HEARING ( V ) | |
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.