Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Taylor, Kimberlee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Taylor, Patrick Edward, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with BAUER, SHERWOOD JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT UNTIL JULY 15, 2016 ( V ) | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT UNTIL JULY 15, 2016 ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3945.1402 / 4260515) ( V ) | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLERK ( V ) | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V ) | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HEARING SET FOR 12/20/2016 AT 1:30 PM IN 4A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BAUER, SHERWOOD | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) ( V ) | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2016DR003088, TAYLOR, KIMBERLEE VS. TAYLOR, PATRICK EDWARD - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 3 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SFWS-12/13/2016,PTN-12/13/2016,DFH-12/13/2016" | |
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event | FAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.