Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Borras, Julio Adam, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Borras, Joanna Lynn, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with SCHWAB, CHARLES A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHWAB, CHARLES A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2016 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2017000000392 | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3945.1143 / 4260446) ( V ) | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ( V ) | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | PRO-SE HEARING SET FOR 12/20/2016 AT 2:45 PM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | SECOND ORDER SETTING HEARING ( V ) | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | PRO-SE HEARING SET FOR 11/01/2016 AT 3:00 PM IN 4B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: SCHWAB, CHARLES | |
October 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.