Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Cohen, Aaron David, Cohen, Alissa R, against Broder, Jacob Nathan, represented by Digiovanni, Ryan, Mccarthy, Justin Jeremiah, Ruiz, Robert Jason, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )
Date: October 06, 2017ORDER FROM DCA ( V )
Date: December 29, 2017JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )
Date: October 11, 2017JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4053.408 / 4360036) ( V )
Date: October 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | COLLECTION COURT HEARING SET FOR 10/25/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN M/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR COLLECTION COURT | |
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUMMARY ( V ) | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4255.2424 / 4553677) ( V ) | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FROM DCA ( V ) | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE ( V ) | |
October 31, 2017 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2016CF003453 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BRODER, JACOB NATHAN - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 2 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NRPDA-7/13/2017,NRPDA-6/30/2017" | |
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event | CLERK ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.