Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ibm Southeast Employees' Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bennis, Randy Michael, against Gomez, Walter, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with ROBY, WILLIAM L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBY, WILLIAM L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney RANDY MICHAEL BENNIS - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.3945.2361 / 4260747) ( V ) | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT ( V ) | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE ( V ) | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT ( V ) | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ON 2 MOTIONS ( V ) | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.