Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Welch, Richard David, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Oldham, Brenda Lee, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with BRONIS, BARBARA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRONIS, BARBARA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 26, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney DOUGLAS EDWARD REYMORE JR. - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY OF RECEIPT ( V ) | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT RETURNED ( V ) | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE ( V ) | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL ( V ) | |
July 20, 2018 | Docket Event | PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4159.1902 / 4461006) ( V ) | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | WRIT OF BODILY ATTACHMENT BOND AMOUNT SET TO $1000.00 | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELIQUENCY ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4158.784 / 4459440) ( V ) | |
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event | PROPOSED REPORT/RECOMMENDATION & FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.