Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ross, Alfred G, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ross, Tiffany, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRIFFIN, VICTORIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney LIZ RHIANNON WILSON - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4277.1835 / 4575860) ( V ) | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( V ) | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V ) | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2015DR002541, ROSS, ALFRED G VS. ROSS, TIFFANY - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: SUMI-4/2/2019" | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR OTHER-IVD | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L: ASSIGNED | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019000028440 RECEIVED FOR FILING NUMBER 87263090 VIA FILINGPAYMENTS20190402235959.TXT. | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.