Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stamper, Christina P, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stamper, Christopher Eugene, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with BRONIS, BARBARA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRONIS, BARBARA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney JAMI L DUCKSON - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION TO RETURN PROPERTY ( V ) | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 05/01/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 4A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BAUER, SHERWOOD JR | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/20/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 4A/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: BAUER, SHERWOOD | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2015DR002498, STAMPER, CHRISTINA P VS. STAMPER, CHRISTOPHER EUGENE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: MRFA-4/11/2017" | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION RETURN OF FIREARM(S) ( V ) | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE BAUER, SHERWOOD: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.